NY S00338 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of campaign funds to pay attorney's fees.
Title
Relates to the use of campaign funds to pay attorney's fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-03-04 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2016-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 338A |
2016-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09331 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - referred to election law