NY S00360 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Title
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.312 |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted for a4431 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-01-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.3 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04431 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - substituted by s360