NY S00383 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Title
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2022 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1920 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02022 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled