NY S00425 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain interested parties or people from civil arrest while going to, remaining at, or returning from the place of such court proceeding.
Title
Exempts certain interested parties or people from civil arrest while going to, remaining at, or returning from the place of such court proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.322 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.759 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S425A |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.93 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | amended on third reading 2176a |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.484 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2176A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.759 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 425A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02176 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - signed chap.322