NY S00428 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Title
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 428B |
2020-01-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 428A |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.189 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00047 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes