NY S00432 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the judge shall not prohibit a parent from undergoing gender reassignment.
Title
Provides that the judge shall not prohibit a parent from undergoing gender reassignment.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.872 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 432A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00861 (Same As) 2020-07-19 - amend and recommit to rules 861a