NY S00452 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to setting the rate of credit per kilowatt hour for farm waste generating equipment customer-generators, which includes the anaerobic digestion of agricultural waste; sets a rate for anaerobic digestion of agricultural waste to at least 12 cents per kilowatt hour.
Title
Relates to setting the rate of credit per kilowatt hour for farm waste generating equipment customer-generators, which includes the anaerobic digestion of agricultural waste; sets a rate for anaerobic digestion of agricultural waste to at least 12 cents per kilowatt hour.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.317 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02283 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to energy