NY S00456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to fair, non-biased compensation; provides for remedies and enforcement where an employee believes he or she is being discriminated against in terms of compensation in violation of section 115 of the civil service law; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to fair, non-biased compensation; provides for remedies and enforcement where an employee believes he or she is being discriminated against in terms of compensation in violation of section 115 of the civil service law; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading cal.176
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a1047b
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 456B
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 456A
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.521
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01047 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s456b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00456&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00456&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00456
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00456&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00456A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00456&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00456B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S456#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S456#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00456&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback