NY S00479 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the criminal street gang related crimes act; provides for enhanced criminal sanctions where crimes are related to criminal street gangs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the criminal street gang related crimes act; provides for enhanced criminal sanctions where crimes are related to criminal street gangs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2011-03-31SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2011-02-22SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2011-01-05SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A03835 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback