NY S00479 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires establishment of model community programs, including a model telephone reassurance program and a model visiting program for elders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires establishment of model community programs, including a model telephone reassurance program and a model visiting program for elders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2015-05-19SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2015-01-07SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A05337 (Same As) 2016-03-02 - REFERRED TO AGING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback