NY S00482 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that limited liability for persons held jointly liable shall not apply to parties held liable for failing to provide reasonable security or failing to provide security required by federal, state or local law, rules or regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that limited liability for persons held jointly liable shall not apply to parties held liable for failing to provide reasonable security or failing to provide security required by federal, state or local law, rules or regulations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.139
2019-01-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 482A
2019-01-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A00361 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.94

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback