NY S00499 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to elevated lead levels in children, and requires insurance companies to cover testing for elevated lead levels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to elevated lead levels in children, and requires insurance companies to cover testing for elevated lead levels.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 499B
2019-05-10SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-03-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 499A
2019-03-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A07687 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback