NY S00508 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-02-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-11SenateAMENDED 508A
2019-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.99
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02070 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback