NY S00509 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits participation in games of bingo by minors who are accompanied by an adult.
Title
Permits participation in games of bingo by minors who are accompanied by an adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2020-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.48 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.62 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A01439 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering