NY S00516 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances the assisted outpatient treatment program; eliminates the expiration and repeal of Kendra's Law.
Title
Enhances the assisted outpatient treatment program; eliminates the expiration and repeal of Kendra's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.722 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 516B |
2018-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 516A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.407 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00604 (Same As) 2018-01-25 - print number 604a