NY S00516 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time period during which absentee ballots shall be mailed or delivered after an application for such ballot is received by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to the time period during which absentee ballots shall be mailed or delivered after an application for such ballot is received by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-01-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.5 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09376 (Same As) 2022-02-23 - referred to election law