NY S00517 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Title
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-07-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 517C |
2020-07-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1410 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 517B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 517A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00272 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary