NY S00521 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.113
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates that portion of state route 17 in the village of Hillburn, town of Ramapo, county of Rockland, as the "Justice Thurgood Marshall Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates that portion of state route 17 in the village of Hillburn, town of Ramapo, county of Rockland, as the "Justice Thurgood Marshall Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.113 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.420 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a5939 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 521A |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.49 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05939 (Same As) 2019-07-24 - SIGNED CHAP.113