NY S00533 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 533B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 533B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for coverage of hearing aids for child patients who are covered under a policy or contract of insurance if the hearing aids are fitted and dispensed by a licensed audiologist certified by the American Speech-Language-Hearing Association following medical clearance by a physician licensed to practice medicine and an audiological evaluation medically appropriate to the age of the child.
Title
Provides for coverage of hearing aids for child patients who are covered under a policy or contract of insurance if the hearing aids are fitted and dispensed by a licensed audiologist certified by the American Speech-Language-Hearing Association following medical clearance by a physician licensed to practice medicine and an audiological evaluation medically appropriate to the age of the child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 533B |
2022-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2022-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 533A |
2022-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05035 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - print number 5035b