NY S00562 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires investigating officers to field test and test blood alcohol levels of all drivers involved in auto accidents where serious physical injury or death occur; imposes rebuttable presumption of guilt for refusals; requires hospital to conduct such test where trauma/injury is considered too severe.
Title
Requires investigating officers to field test and test blood alcohol levels of all drivers involved in auto accidents where serious physical injury or death occur; imposes rebuttable presumption of guilt for refusals; requires hospital to conduct such test where trauma/injury is considered too severe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1267 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01895 (Same As) 2011-01-12 - referred to transportation