NY S00565 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the department of health to review the safety of ultraviolet nail dryers and authorizes the department of state to promulgate any regulations deemed appropriate for governing the use of such devices by any appearance enhancement business conducting the practice of nail specialty.
Title
Relates to requiring the department of health to review the safety of ultraviolet nail dryers and authorizes the department of state to promulgate any regulations deemed appropriate for governing the use of such devices by any appearance enhancement business conducting the practice of nail specialty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.422 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.167 |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | substituted for a2276 |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.217 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.496 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a2276 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02276 (Same As) 2017-06-05 - substituted by s565