NY S00578 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to allow distillers and brewers to file their taxes electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to allow distillers and brewers to file their taxes electronically.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.374
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6642
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.130
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06642 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s578

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback