NY S00583 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 583A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 583A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permanent total disability eligibility, providing a presumption of permanent total disability for employees who are found eligible for federal social security disability benefits.
Title
Relates to permanent total disability eligibility, providing a presumption of permanent total disability for employees who are found eligible for federal social security disability benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 583A |
2018-03-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A09536 (Same As) 2018-01-19 - referred to labor