NY S00592 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "tobacco-free pharmacies act"; provides that no pharmacy shall sell or cause to be sold tobacco products; imposes civil penalties.
Title
Enacts the "tobacco-free pharmacies act"; provides that no pharmacy shall sell or cause to be sold tobacco products; imposes civil penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | AMENDED 592A |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.190 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00389 (Same As) 2020-08-28 - enacting clause stricken