NY S00660 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08AssemblySIGNED CHAP.457
2019-10-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-01-22Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-01-22Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-22Assemblyordered to third reading cal.7
2019-01-22Assemblysubstituted for a584
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-01-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.35
2019-01-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A00584 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - substituted by s660

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback