NY S00678 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a leave of absence for military spouses; removes the requirement that leave be used when a person's spouse is on leave while deployed to a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Title
Relates to a leave of absence for military spouses; removes the requirement that leave be used when a person's spouse is on leave while deployed to a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01978 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - held for consideration in labor