NY S00709 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary commission on AMBER Alert effectiveness to study and make recommendations on any improvements that may be taken toward the activation and dissemination of the alert; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishes a temporary commission on AMBER Alert effectiveness to study and make recommendations on any improvements that may be taken toward the activation and dissemination of the alert; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.715 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |