NY S00715 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of human rights to enforce provisions relating to real estate brokers and unlawful discriminatory practices; awards compensatory damages to the aggrieved person; assesses a civil penalty to vindicate the public interest; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of human rights to enforce provisions relating to real estate brokers and unlawful discriminatory practices; awards compensatory damages to the aggrieved person; assesses a civil penalty to vindicate the public interest; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.674 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.130 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05480 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations