NY S00724 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the payment of prevailing wages on construction projects involving the state university of New York, the dormitory authority or the state university construction fund and any third party.
Title
Requires the payment of prevailing wages on construction projects involving the state university of New York, the dormitory authority or the state university construction fund and any third party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-08 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08395 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to labor