NY S00724 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the sale and possession of sparkling devices outside of cities with a population of one million or more; removes requirement that localities authorize sparkling devices in their jurisdictions; authorizes counties to opt out if they pass a local law.
Title
Relates to authorizing the sale and possession of sparkling devices outside of cities with a population of one million or more; removes requirement that localities authorize sparkling devices in their jurisdictions; authorizes counties to opt out if they pass a local law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.371 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.323 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a2290c |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 724A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1019 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02290 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s724a