NY S00725 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all special education students attending schools scheduled to be closed or to undergo a significant change be assigned to new schools prior to the implementation of the closing or change.
Title
Requires that all special education students attending schools scheduled to be closed or to undergo a significant change be assigned to new schools prior to the implementation of the closing or change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate New York City Education Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate New York City Education Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1231 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08669 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education