NY S00727 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.629
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.629
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the banking development districts program.
Title
Relates to the banking development districts program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.629 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a3320 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 727A |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.181 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03320 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.629