NY S00731 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to available transportation for correction facility visitation; provides for at a minimum, bi-monthly free transportation from the city of New York, Rochester, Syracuse, Buffalo and Albany.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to available transportation for correction facility visitation; provides for at a minimum, bi-monthly free transportation from the city of New York, Rochester, Syracuse, Buffalo and Albany.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.595
2019-03-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 731A
2019-02-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A05942 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback