NY S00741 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a person is guilty of grand larceny in the fourth degree when he or she steals property and is in possession of an anti-security item; makes criminal possession of an anti-security item a class A misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a person is guilty of grand larceny in the fourth degree when he or she steals property and is in possession of an anti-security item; makes criminal possession of an anti-security item a class A misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-04-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-04-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-04-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.379
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A01895 (Same As) 2013-11-27 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback