NY S00741 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the superintendent of state police to develop and institute child-sensitive arrest policies and procedures for instances where police are arresting an individual who is a parent, guardian or other person legally charged with the care or custody of a child.
Title
Directs the superintendent of state police to develop and institute child-sensitive arrest policies and procedures for instances where police are arresting an individual who is a parent, guardian or other person legally charged with the care or custody of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.716 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07439 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules