NY S00744 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when the division of criminal justice services conducts a search of its criminal history records and returns a report thereon, all references to undisposed cases shall be excluded.
Title
Provides that when the division of criminal justice services conducts a search of its criminal history records and returns a report thereon, all references to undisposed cases shall be excluded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.280 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04048 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes