NY S00750 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 750A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 750A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the sexual assault forensic examiner grant program to award grants to provide statewide access to services provided by sexual assault forensic examiners to victims of sexual assault.
Title
Establishes the sexual assault forensic examiner grant program to award grants to provide statewide access to services provided by sexual assault forensic examiners to victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 750A |
2020-01-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02055 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - print number 2055a