NY S00752 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 752A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 752A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the tax credit provided for solar energy system equipment from $5,000 to $10,000 and amends the definition of solar energy system equipment.
Title
Relates to increasing the tax credit provided for solar energy system equipment from $5,000 to $10,000 and amends the definition of solar energy system equipment.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 752A |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.486 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06420 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means