NY S00783 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the transitional green development program; provides for a two-year grant to be funded through the empire state development corporation not to exceed $150,000.
Title
Establishes the transitional green development program; provides for a two-year grant to be funded through the empire state development corporation not to exceed $150,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 783A |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.66 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |