NY S00844 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the small business regional revolving loan program.
Title
Relates to the small business regional revolving loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.507 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 844A |
2019-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07360 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to small business