NY S00852 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of agriculture and markets and the state soil and water conservation committee to review and define farm conservation practices which are within the professions of engineering, land surveying and architecture.
Title
Directs the department of agriculture and markets and the state soil and water conservation committee to review and define farm conservation practices which are within the professions of engineering, land surveying and architecture.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2018-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.663 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.176 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A05007 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to agriculture