NY S00855 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.
Title
Relates to state government integrity including the creation of a New York state government integrity commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-01-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01929 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary