NY S00858 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to clarifying provisions prohibiting wage theft; provides that there are no exceptions to liability for failure to pay wages.
Title
Relates to clarifying provisions prohibiting wage theft; provides that there are no exceptions to liability for failure to pay wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.397 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a1893 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.114 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01893 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - substituted by s858