NY S00874 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rights of residents of adult care facilities; provides that residents have a right to be informed about their condition, treatment and medications.
Title
Relates to rights of residents of adult care facilities; provides that residents have a right to be informed about their condition, treatment and medications.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | approval memo.37 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | signed chap.646 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.618 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S874 |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-02-12 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.36 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1084 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.618 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01084 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - approval memo.37