NY S00878 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to working with the USDA to receive approvals and develop online fresh food purchasing options throughout the state; adds a repeal date.
Title
Relates to working with the USDA to receive approvals and develop online fresh food purchasing options throughout the state; adds a repeal date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.15 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.28 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | substituted for a1262 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2021-01-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.31 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01262 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - substituted by s878