NY S00898 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide funding to substance use disorder and/or compulsive gambling programs operated by for profit agencies.
Title
Authorizes the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide funding to substance use disorder and/or compulsive gambling programs operated by for profit agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2018-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 898A |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.86 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A08022 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse