NY S00901 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to supermarkets providing excess edible food to food relief organizations.
Title
Relates to supermarkets providing excess edible food to food relief organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.63 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.40 |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | substituted for a963 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-01-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.54 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00963 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - substituted by s901