NY S00911 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 394 between the town of Kennedy and the village of Falconer, county of Chautauqua, as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 394 between the town of Kennedy and the village of Falconer, county of Chautauqua, as the "Staff Sergeant David Textor Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05567 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - print number 5567a
S06518 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06518 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN