NY S00925 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Title
Extends murder in the first degree to include victims who are members of the military or reserves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.618 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1021 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01910 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - enacting clause stricken