NY S00936 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4827A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4827A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Title
Establishes a task force on veteran employment opportunities, including membership requirements and powers and duties of the task force; and provides for the repeal of such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4827A |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.779 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 936A |
2018-03-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.605 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04827 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled